Case: AP-69,291
AP-69,291
02/27/1985
Appeal Case Type
WILKERSON, RICHARD JAMES
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/12/1986 | BRIEF FILED | State | |
12/20/1985 | BRIEF FILED | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/08/1993 | WRIT OF CERT USSC | DENIED | |
09/08/1993 | WRIT OF CERT USSC | Filed | |
08/31/1993 | EXECUTED | | |
04/14/1987 | MANDATE ISSD | | |
03/30/1987 | WRIT OF CERT USSC | DENIED | |
01/08/1987 | WRIT OF CERT USSC | Filed | |
11/17/1986 | MAN STAYED BY USSC | | |
11/06/1986 | STAY MANDAT MOT TO | Granted | |
11/04/1986 | STAY MANDAT MOT TO | Filed | |
10/13/1986 | STAY MANDAT MOT TO | Granted | |
10/08/1986 | STAY MANDAT MOT TO | Filed | |
09/24/1986 | REHEAR DISP | DENIED | |
05/29/1986 | REHEAR RECEIVED | | |
05/14/1986 | OPINION ISSD | Affirmed | |
05/14/1986 | OPINION ISSD | Affirmed | |
04/23/1986 | SUBMITTED | | |
03/12/1986 | BRIEF FILED | | |
03/12/1986 | SET FOR SUBMIS DP | | |
01/29/1986 | EXT BRIEF DISP | Granted | |
01/21/1986 | EXT BRIEF FILED | | |
12/23/1985 | ORDER FILED | | |
12/20/1985 | AFFIDAVIT FILED | | |
12/20/1985 | BRIEF FILED | | |
12/20/1985 | EXT BRIEF DISP | Granted | |
12/20/1985 | EXT BRIEF FILED | | |
12/17/1985 | OFFICER RETURN REC | | |
12/11/1985 | NOTICE SHOW CAUSE | | |
12/11/1985 | ORDER FILED | | |
07/22/1985 | EXT BRIEF DISP | Granted | |
07/22/1985 | EXT BRIEF FILED | | |
03/27/1985 | EXT BRIEF DISP | Granted | |
03/26/1985 | EXT BRIEF FILED | | |
02/27/1985 | RECORD FILED | | |
05/31/1984 | EXT SF DISP | Granted | |
05/30/1984 | EXT SF FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/14/1987 | STORED | CASE STORED |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Wilkerson, Richard James | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | C. Logan Dietz |
STATE OF TEXAS | State | John Holmes |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
179th District Court
Harris
383,749