Case: 10-04-00088-CV
10-04-00088-CV
04/21/2004
Miscellaneous civil
Sharon L. Graham
Billie Graham
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/23/2012 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
01/09/2012 | Letter to trial court clerk for return of record | | |
10/10/2005 | Case stored | | |
10/10/2005 | Mandate issued by this Court | | |
06/22/2005 | Retention time case file will be retained | | |
06/22/2005 | Judgment entered by this court | | |
06/22/2005 | Memorandum opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
06/22/2005 | Submitted | | |
06/01/2005 | Case advanced without oral argument | | |
11/09/2004 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/08/2004 | Motion for extension of time to file brief | | |
11/05/2004 | Supplemental Clerk's Record filed | | |
10/18/2004 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/18/2004 | Brief filed, oral argument requested | | |
10/05/2004 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/16/2004 | Motion for extension of time to file brief | | |
08/23/2004 | Supplemental Clerk's Record filed | | |
08/17/2004 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/16/2004 | Brief filed, oral argument requested | | |
08/16/2004 | Motion for extension of time to file brief | | |
08/03/2004 | Supplemental Clerk's Record filed | | |
07/30/2004 | Record checked out - see remarks | | |
07/20/2004 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/16/2004 | Motion for extension of time to file brief | | |
06/29/2004 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/28/2004 | Motion for extension of time to file brief | | |
05/28/2004 | Clerk's Record filed | | |
05/06/2004 | Reporter's Record filed | | |
05/05/2004 | Docketing Statement filed | | |
04/21/2004 | $125.00 filing fee for record due | | |
04/21/2004 | Notice of Appeal Filed - Civil Case | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/23/2012 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Graham, Sharon L. | Appellant | Ronald E. Harden |
Graham, Billie | Appellee | Mary Lou Shipley |
Trial Court Information
40th District Court
Ellis
Honorable Gene Knize
55,282