Case: 01-85-00043-CR
01-85-00043-CR
01/23/1985
Assault & battery
McPherson, Brian Kee
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
08/04/1986 | Case file received by higher Court or agency. | | |
06/25/1986 | Complete record forwarded to atty general office | | |
10/01/1985 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
08/15/1985 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
08/08/1985 | Submitted | | |
07/17/1985 | Submission | | |
06/26/1985 | Brief filed | | |
06/06/1985 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
05/29/1985 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
04/29/1985 | Brief filed | | |
04/03/1985 | Record filed | | |
01/23/1985 | Notice of appeal filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/01/1985 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State | Criminal - State of Texas | |
State | Criminal - State of Texas | |
State | Criminal - State of Texas | |
State | Criminal - Appellant |
Trial Court Information
209th District Court
Harris
410,394
75 years TDC