judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ABBEY, PAMELA JACKSON, MICHAEL D.

Case Information: 86-CV-1066
Short Caption:ABBEY, PAMELA JACKSON, MICHAEL D.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead:86-CV-1066Consolidated: 86-CV-1324
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA12064-81Filed Date:07/02/1986

Opening Event Date:07/02/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/31/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/20/1988
Argued/Submitted:06/14/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/22/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
A. Palmer Ifill YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Kenneth W. Curtis NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ABBEY, PAMELA JACKSON, MICHAEL D.
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 101586 ORDER: GRANT APLT MO NOTE - 01 TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; NOTE - 02 GRANT MO OF APLT TO DEEM REC NOTE - 02 IN #82-1379 AS PART OF RECORD NOTE - 03 IN THIS APPEAL; NO 7A; APLT TO NOTE - 03 FILE DR & SRT W/CLK OF SUP CT NOTE - 04 & SERVE COPIES W/IN 10 DAYS. NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 CON 86-1324 NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 12/1/87 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO FOR NOTE - 06 LV TO FILE BR. AND APLE'S MO NOTE - 07 TO EXT TM TO FILE OPPO TO APLT NOTE - 07 MOTION; CLK DIRTD TO FILE NOTE - 08 LODGED APLT'S BRIEF AND APLE'S NOTE - 08 OPPO. FO THAT APLE'S BRIEF NOTE - 09 SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE NOTE - 09 12/14/87 (NFX).
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/06/14 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - IFILLA FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - CURTISK FOR - APPELLEE
07/02/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/22/1986CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/22/1986MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO CERT. REC. IN CASE 82-1379 AS PART. REC IN THIS CASE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/10/1986MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO ACCEPT FOR FILING PET. FOR LVE TO APPEAL IN FP RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/15/1986MEMORANDUM RECORD IN 82-1379 DEEMED PART OF RECORD IN THIS APPEAL. EBP PANEL SCDATE 092286 SCHPRD OPE
10/15/1986ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 04. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 072186 SCHPRD CHECK
11/04/1986RECEIVED DESIGNATION OF RECORD AND STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT (APPELLANT'S) RJG PANEL SCDATE 102786 SCHPRD DR
11/06/1986APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DR & SRT JB PANEL SCDATE 110786 SCHPRD CHECK
11/28/1986DESIGNATION OF RECORD AND SRT SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/03/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (EXHIBIT: 1 BROWN ENVELOPE)( RTC) GG PANEL SCDATE 012887 SCHPRD R
07/30/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (824 PGS. - RONAN) PM PANEL SCDATE 040287 SCHPRD RT
07/31/1987FiledRecord Completed
07/31/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/06/1987ORDER SS, CONS 86-1066 & 86-1324; THE CONS BR OF APLT DUE W/IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 090987 SCHPRD BA
09/14/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF & APPENDIX PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/15/1987APLT MO FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN EXCESS OF PAGESPB PANEL SCDATE 091587 SCHPRD BA
11/13/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DEC. 14TH MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/19/1987APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 112587 SCHPRD OPA
12/01/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 6 THRU 9 SL PANELPY SCDATE 112387 SCHPRD SL
12/01/1987APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO APLT'S MOTION TO FILE BRIEF SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/14/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DEC. 31ST MLH PANEL SCDATE 121487 SCHPRD BE
12/17/1987APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF & TO SUBMIT CASE ON THE RECORD JB PANEL SCDATE 122387 SCHPRD OPA
01/20/1988FiledBriefing Completed
01/20/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/20/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE & CLK TO FL BRF OF APLE; CLK TO SCHED FOR CONSIDERATION ASAP. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 011988 SCHPRD X
06/14/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/14/1988ARGUED PANELFESTGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/30/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFESTGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/30/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
07/22/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD