judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

IRA COXSON v. ATLANTA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case: A-74
A-74
02/21/1944
Application for Writ of Error
IRA COXSON
ATLANTA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/29/1944Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/05/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/03/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
02/21/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/29/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/05/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/15/1944Bond
03/08/1944Document received (See Remarks)
03/03/1944Response to Petition
02/21/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/21/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Wade, Ford and DukeAmicus Curiae
Atlanta Life Insurance CompanyRespondent
Ira CoxsonPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information