judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHARLES WAYNE PALMER, JR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-273)
Case Number:06-273Case Docketed On:11/30/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Platte CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:CHARLES WAYNE PALMER, JR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CHARLES WAYNE PALMER, JR., Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCharles Wayne Palmer Jr.Ethelyn (Lynn) Boak
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Dana Jill Lent

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2008 WY 7
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/30/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/30/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/30/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/30/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/16/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/18/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/13/2007Motion - Remand- motion for limited remand and stay of appeal.MotionRemandFinal
02/14/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/14/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/06/2007Order - Deny - motion for limited remand.OrderDenyFinal
03/16/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/03/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy on disk and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
05/04/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
05/16/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
05/17/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/22/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/01/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, six volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volumes II, IV - VI, Transcripts; Volume III, ExhibitsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/25/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/12/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/12/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/12/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/12/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/15/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 02/14/08 by Ronda Stumbough.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal