Case: 04-07-00608-CR
04-07-00608-CR
08/31/2007
Driving While Intoxicated
Jeff Diehl a/k/a Jeffrey Diehl
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/06/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | State | |
01/24/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
08/19/2008 | Mandate acknowledged by trial court clerk | | |
08/07/2008 | Mandate issued | | |
07/08/2008 | Letter filed | | |
07/07/2008 | Letter issued by the court | | |
06/04/2008 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed | |
05/13/2008 | Submitted | | |
04/03/2008 | Set for submission on briefs | | |
03/07/2008 | Case ready to be set | | |
03/06/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |
02/25/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/25/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |
01/24/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |
01/03/2008 | Order entered | | |
01/03/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/18/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |
11/20/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/19/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |
10/18/2007 | Reporters Record Filed | | |
10/15/2007 | Clerks Record Filed | | |
08/31/2007 | Staff Attorney has been assigned to the case | | |
08/31/2007 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
08/30/2007 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
08/17/2007 | Date of Sentencing in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/07/2008 | Case Stored | Permanent retention required in criminal case |
08/07/2008 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Alan E. Battaglia |
Diehl, Jeff | Criminal - Appellant | Lori O. Miller |
Trial Court Information
175th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Mary D. Roman
2007-CR-4616
25 YEARS TDCJ