Case: 05-07-01029-CV
05-07-01029-CV
08/06/2007
Miscellaneous civil
In The Interest of C.J.M.S., a child
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/23/2009 | Mandate issued | | |
10/22/2008 | Opinion issued | Remanded | |
08/21/2007 | Record due | | |
08/17/2007 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
08/16/2007 | Letter Filed | | |
08/09/2007 | 125.00 Filing Fee Due | | |
08/09/2007 | Findings of Fact & Conclusion of Law Filed | | |
08/06/2007 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
08/06/2007 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
08/06/2007 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
07/26/2007 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
04/25/2007 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |
04/23/2007 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/23/2009 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Dwight Edward West, Jr. | Appellee | Stephen D. Skinner |
Meleaha Stewart | Appellee | Meleaha Stewart |
Office Of The Attorney General | Appellant | Ms. Rande K. Herrell |
Child Support Systems Of Texas | Appellee | W. K. (Bo) Brown |
Trial Court Information
301st Judicial District Court
Dallas
99-15004-T
.