Case: D-1299
D-1299
07/16/1991
App Writ of Error
IRENE FELCHAK et vir KENNETH FELCHAK
ROBERT K. PEARDON et ux. JO PEARDON
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/06/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
07/31/1991 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
07/16/1991 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/06/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
10/21/1991 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | No Rehearing Filed | | |
09/18/1991 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | Writ Denied | |
08/01/1991 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
08/01/1991 | No description available. | | | |
07/31/1991 | Reply to Response | | | |
07/16/1991 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
10/21/1991 | Case Stored | Case stored. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
PEARDON, ROBERT K. | Respondent | Mr. James Boanerges |
FELCHAK, KENNETH | Petitioner | Mr. Albert Hollan |
PEARDON, JO | Respondent | Mr. James Boanerges |
FELCHAK, IRENE | Petitioner | Mr. Ray Hensarling |
Court of Appeals Information:
09-90-00116-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
RULE 90, 05-30-91
9th Court of Appeals
Honorable DON BURGESS
Trial Court Information
253rd District Court
Liberty
42873