judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EGBERTO (RICKY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 32306
Short Caption:EGBERTO (RICKY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 8800637CClassification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/06/1998How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/07/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/07/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
07/09/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 32306, 32329.
11/06/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy.
11/06/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-12069
08/08/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13728
08/08/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/11/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 9, 2000. 00-13728