judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JESSE THOMAS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-266)
Case Number:06-266Case Docketed On:11/29/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:JESSE THOMAS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JESSE THOMAS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJesse ThomasDiane M. Lozano
David E. Westling
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 186
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/29/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/29/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/29/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/12/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/16/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/02/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/06/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/13/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/16/2007Order - Grant - third extension of time - brief of appellant - no further.OrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
05/16/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
06/19/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
06/25/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/09/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/11/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/19/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts; Volume III, confidential folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/19/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
11/20/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/26/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Opinion sent to Warden and signed for by D. Lopez on 11/21/07.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
12/06/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/06/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/06/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/06/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/11/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal