Case: 03-05-00460-CR
03-05-00460-CR
07/18/2005
Murder
Cassandra Joyce Williams
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/04/2008 | Mandate issued | | |||||
03/21/2008 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
02/25/2008 | Case reassigned to a new panel | | |||||
06/12/2006 | Submitted | | |||||
06/09/2006 | Corrected brief filed | | |||||
06/05/2006 | Brief received, not filed | | |||||
04/26/2006 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||||
04/17/2006 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
03/16/2006 | Corrected brief filed | | |||||
03/16/2006 | miscellaneous motion disp | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
03/13/2006 | Brief received, not filed | | |||||
03/13/2006 | miscellaneous motion filed | | |||||
03/03/2006 | Brief received, not filed | | |||||
01/19/2006 | Order Entered | Ordered |
| ||||
12/28/2005 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
12/22/2005 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||||
12/09/2005 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
12/07/2005 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||||
11/22/2005 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
11/21/2005 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||||
11/09/2005 | Appellant's brief overdue notice in criminal case | | |||||
09/30/2005 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |||||
08/16/2005 | Supplemental Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||
08/05/2005 | Notice received | | |||||
08/05/2005 | Trial Court Certification Missing | | |||||
08/04/2005 | Telephone call received by the clerk's office from attorney, clerk or reporter | | |||||
08/02/2005 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||
08/01/2005 | Mot - Ext. time file NOA Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
07/20/2005 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||||
07/18/2005 | Mot.- Ext. time file NOA | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/04/2008 | Case Stored | Case stored |
06/04/2008 | Retention | Criminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | The Honorable Sam Oatman Mr. Thomas O. Cloudt |
Williams, Cassandra Joyce | Criminal - Appellant | Mr. Timothy W. Inman |
Trial Court Information
33rd District Court
Burnet
Honorable Guilford L. Jones
9794
50 yrs + $10,000 fine