judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DEANNE R. UPSON V. RONA M. FIELDS

Case Information: 10-FM-0801
Short Caption:DEANNE R. UPSON V. RONA M. FIELDSClassification:Appeals - Family - Other Family
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CPO1151-10Filed Date:06/17/2010

Opening Event Date:06/17/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/31/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/16/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDeanne R. Upson YPro SeN
AppelleeRona M. Fields NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/17/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/23/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on June 29, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was granted in forma pauperis status in the trial court, and it further appearing that transcript may be needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file with the Court Reporting Division a motion for preparation of transcripts of proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s), for determination in accordance with Hancock v. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co., 472 A.2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10(b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit the motion to the appropriate judge for a decision as to whether transcripts will be provided at no cost. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of that motion with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC)
08/31/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (65pgs/Tape) 5/18/10 proc. w/CD included
08/31/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/02/2010RECORD COPIES
09/02/2010RECORD INDEX
09/07/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk. copy of order sent to both addresses.
10/12/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (titled: Motion to Stay)
11/03/2010ORD GRANT APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to the extent that the brief and limited appendix shall be filed on or before January 31, 2011. (JAC)
01/14/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY
02/09/2011ORDER DENYING APPELLANT MOTION FOR STAY F/O that appellant's brief and limited appendix shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. (ETW)
03/15/2011RECEIVED - aplt's brief and appdx (Both returned, MALB required)
04/22/2011ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
04/22/2011DISMISSED
05/16/2011MANDATE ISSUED