judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DAHYA VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 36224
Short Caption:DAHYA VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0000110Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:02/07/2001 at 8:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:02/07/2001How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/05/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Woodburn and Wedge--check no. 57144.
06/05/2000Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition. 00-09405
06/06/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Affidavit of party beneficially interested and proof of service on district judge. Due Date: 10 days
06/08/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit. Affidavit of Personal Service on Judge Steinheimer. 00-09719
06/09/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit. Affidavit for Writ of Prohibition. 00-09824
06/30/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. The real party in interest, on behalf of the respondents shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. Additionally, we stay all further proceedings in District Court Case No. CV0000110 pending our review of this matter. 00-11252
07/28/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. to File Answer. 00-13156
08/03/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. on Judge Steinheimer. (Filed via fax--OK per AH) 00-13465
08/03/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We grant the real party in interest's motion for an extension of time, to and including August 30, 2000, to file and serve an answer to the petition for writ of prohibition. No further extensions shall be permitted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 00-13470
08/07/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Objection to Request for Thirty-Day Extension. 00-13676
08/15/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On July 28, 2000, real party in interest filed a motion to extend time to file an answer. The motion was granted on August 3, 2000. On August 7, 2000, petitioner filed an opposition to the motion to extend time. We elect to treat petitioner's opposition as a motion for reconsidersation and, no good cause appearing, we deny reconsideration. 00-14210
08/29/2000Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Real Party in Interest's Answering Brief. 00-15214
09/22/2000MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Petitioner's Request to File Reply Brief. 00-16794
10/03/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We grant the motion and direct the clerk of this court to file the proposed reply received on September 22, 2000. 00-17535
10/03/2000Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Petition. Petition for Writ of Prohibition Petitioner's Reply Brief. 00-16795
12/20/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on February 7, 2001 at 8:30 a.m. (En Banc)
01/24/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
02/07/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. EN BANC-WM/CY/MS/DA/RR/ML/NB
03/14/2001Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted." We grant the petition and direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of prohibition. Before the Court En Banc. By the Court, Leavitt, J. 117 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 20. En Banc. 01-04511
03/14/2001WritIssued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of opinion mailed to Stephen S. Kent for service upon Judge Connie J. Steinheimer. 01-04535
03/19/2001WritFiled Writ. Served on Judge Steinheimer on March 16, 2001. 01-04535
04/10/2001RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 01-04577
04/10/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.