judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KIRK ERWIN STEFFEY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-105)
Case Number:06-105Case Docketed On:05/17/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:KIRK ERWIN STEFFEY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:KIRK ERWIN STEFFEY, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKirk Erwin SteffeyKenneth M. Koski
Donna D. Domonkos
Ryan R. Roden
Marion Jane Yoder
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/17/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/17/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/17/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/30/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/05/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/15/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant (no action taken because a motion for voluntary dismissal was submitted same day)MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/15/2006Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with wavierMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
08/17/2006Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
08/17/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal