judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES HOOD V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0802
Short Caption:JAMES HOOD V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-8847-09Filed Date:06/25/2010

Opening Event Date:06/25/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/28/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/13/2012
Argued/Submitted:12/18/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/30/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames Hood YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Margaret E. BarrYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/25/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/20/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Donna Biderman, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
07/20/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Donna Biderman, Esquire
08/10/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
10/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (40 pgs/Coney) 3/17/10 proc.
10/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (67 pgs/Shelton) 3/18/10 proc.
10/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (211 pgs/Hunt) 3/22/10 proc.
10/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (31 pgs/Johnson) 3/23/10 proc.
10/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (9 pgs/Johnson) 3/24/10 proc.
10/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (10 pgs/Johnson) 3/25/10 proc.
10/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (13 pgs/tape) 6/4/10 proc. cd attached
10/07/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
10/08/2010RECORD INDEX
10/08/2010RECORD COPIES
10/08/2010FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (SEALED documents)
12/01/2010 On consideration of this court's order of October 7, 2010, directing counsel for appellant to file the brief, and the limited appendix as required by D.C.App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
12/28/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to Apr. 15, 2011 no oppo
01/04/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before April 15, 2011. (Castillo)
04/18/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF May 9, 2011 (unopposed)
04/21/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before May 9, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (Castillo)
05/09/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until 40 days after the completion of the transcripts
07/08/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, wherein appellant indicate(s) that transcript is being prepared, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the brief of appellant shall be filed within 40 days from the date the transcript is filed with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall advise this court within 15 days thereof of appellant's receipt of the ordered transcript. (JAC)
09/28/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #9 (6 pgs/tape) 3/24/10 proc.
09/28/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #10 (4 pgs/tape) 3/25/10 proc. w/cd
09/28/2011FiledRECORD COMPLETED
01/26/2012FiledBriefing Order
03/05/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
03/19/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting MOET
06/26/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
07/12/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Leave to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
07/12/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
07/12/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
08/13/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
08/13/2012FiledBriefing Completed
10/03/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
11/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/18/2012FiledSubmitted To Washington,Thompson,Farrell
01/08/2013FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Thompson, Associate Judge, and Farrell, Senior Judge.)
01/30/2013FiledMandate
02/27/2013FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)