judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-83
A-83
03/06/1944
Application for Writ of Error
J. R. RAGLAND, ANCILLARY ADMINISTRATOR
JOHN WAGENER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/01/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/01/1944Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/10/1944Brief on the MeritsRespondent
03/16/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
03/06/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/08/1944Letter Filed
06/01/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/01/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/10/1944Brief on the Merits
04/07/1944Bond
03/22/1944Document received (See Remarks)
03/16/1944Response to Petition
03/06/1944Additional Copies receivedFiling granted
03/06/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/06/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
J. R. Ragland, Ancillary AdministratorPetitioner
John WagenerRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information