Case: 02-95-00496-CR
02-95-00496-CR
11/29/1995
Capital Murder
Yesconis, Jennifer Nicole
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/05/1998 | Mandate Issued | | |
04/29/1998 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA | Refused | |
01/23/1998 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA | | |
01/20/1998 | Mo for Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/15/1997 | Mo for Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/13/1997 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
03/26/1997 | Submitted | | |
03/26/1997 | Submission | | |
03/17/1997 | Brief Filed | | |
03/17/1997 | Case ready to be set | | |
12/20/1996 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/16/1996 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
11/20/1996 | Brief Filed | | |
10/17/1996 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/15/1996 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
08/05/1996 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/31/1996 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
06/04/1996 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/04/1996 | No Description Available. | | |
06/04/1996 | No Description Available. | | |
06/04/1996 | Submission | | |
05/31/1996 | No Description Available. | | |
04/08/1996 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/04/1996 | No Description Available. | | |
02/15/1996 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/12/1996 | Jury lists and/or questionnaires filed | | |
02/12/1996 | No Description Available. | | |
02/12/1996 | No Description Available. | | |
11/29/1995 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
11/29/1995 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/05/1998 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Yesconis, Jennifer Nicole | Criminal - Appellant | William Stanley Harris |
Unknown User | Criminal - State of Texas | Charles M. Mallin |
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 2
Tarrant
Honorable Wayne Francis Salvant
0547110D
LIFE - IDTDCJ