Case: 13-03-00516-CV
13-03-00516-CV
09/08/2003
Mandamus
IN RE: SIDNEY LYNN REDELS, D.O.
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/10/2004 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
04/08/2004 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |
03/22/2004 | Form to request stored records | | |
03/08/2004 | Writ Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
12/15/2003 | Record sent to storage | | |
11/19/2003 | Writ Filed | | |
11/06/2003 | Writ Filed | | |
10/02/2003 | Writ Disposed | | |
10/02/2003 | Order Issued with Disposition | Motion or Writ Denied | |
09/19/2003 | Response to _____________. | | |
09/16/2003 | Exhibits Filed | | |
09/08/2003 | Order Entered | | |
09/08/2003 | Filing Fee Paid | | |
09/08/2003 | record | | |
09/08/2003 | Writ Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/02/2003 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
REDELS, D.O., SIDNEY LYNN | Relator | Hon. J. Kevin Oncken |
Hoekstra, M.D., Bruce | Other | Hon. Linda C. Breck Hon. Douglas M. Kennedy Hon. Thomas F. Nye |
Farley, D.O., Derek | Other | Hon. Richard C. Woolsey |
Rejenia Anderson and Jo Blaine Anderson | Real Parties | Randy Howry Sean E. Breen |
Judith Tavares, R.N., Patricia Sohocki, R.N., Sylvia R. Garcia, L.V.N., Thelma Vasquez, L.V.N., Debra Rodriguez, L.V.N, Riverside Hospital | Other | Melanie Breedlove Hon. Diana L. Faust Lanette Matthews John A. Scully |
Trial Court Information
347th District Court
Nueces
Honorable Nelva Gonzales Ramos
02-4195-H