Case: 05-85-00359-CV
05-85-00359-CV
03/25/1985
Contract
Stephanie Gore
Ray Robertson
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/08/2019 | Order entered | Destroy | | ||
01/09/2019 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
06/05/1997 | Case Destroyed | | |||
05/22/1997 | Retention time case file will be retained | Destroy | | ||
01/02/1986 | Mandate Issued | | |||
10/31/1985 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | | ||
10/31/1985 | Submitted | | |||
10/30/1985 | Letter Filed | | |||
10/25/1985 | Letter Filed | | |||
08/29/1985 | MattConv | | |||
07/16/1985 | Brief Filed | | |||
06/18/1985 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
06/18/1985 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
06/14/1985 | Response to Motion | | |||
06/13/1985 | MattConv | | |||
06/10/1985 | Affidavit Filed | | |||
06/10/1985 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
05/28/1985 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |||
05/22/1985 | Brief Filed | | |||
05/20/1985 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |||
05/14/1985 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
05/09/1985 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
05/09/1985 | Response to Motion | | |||
04/09/1985 | MattConv | | |||
04/09/1985 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |||
04/08/1985 | Transcript Filed | | |||
03/25/1985 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||
03/25/1985 | Appeal Bond Filed | | |||
12/31/1984 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/08/2019 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 1
Hunt
Honorable Hunt County Judge, County Court at Law No. 1
CC-194-83