judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NORTH VS. DAHL

Case Information: 31198
Short Caption:NORTH VS. DAHLCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Churchill Co. - Tenth Judicial District - 22595Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/24/1997 / Gruesen, ThomasSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/02/2000How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/15/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
10/15/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
10/22/1997Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Notice to pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due date: 10 days.
10/22/1997Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due date: 10 days.
10/24/1997Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Notice of Settlement Conference. Settlement Judge: Thomas W. Gruesen, Sr. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/06/1997Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. Filing Fee of $200 (Beckley, Singleton, Jemison & List Chtd.- check no. 11913.)
11/18/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsReceived Documents from District Court Clerk. Received a certified copy of the Case Appeal Statement. Filed in the district court November 10, 1997.
11/26/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Appellants shall within 15 days from the date of this order, file the docketing statement or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel for appellants.
03/12/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. Filing fee of $200 (Misty J. Morgan--check no. 838).
03/12/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Proper person Notice of Appeal filed by appellant William North.)
03/17/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Certified copy of Case Appeal Statement. Filed in distirict court on March 12, 1998. (Proper person appellant North).
03/20/1998Other Other. Mailed additional notice of appeal documents to settlement judge Gruesen.
04/13/1998Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal.
04/30/1998Letter/IncomingReceived Letter. Letter from attorney Paul E. Ferguson requesting status of this appeal.
05/06/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Appellants' counsel shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss this entire matter or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. If appellants do not timely file a stipulation or motion to dismiss this entire appeal, appellants' counsel shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file the docketing statement. Failure to timely comply with this order may result in the imposition fo sanctions against counsel.
05/21/1998MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Clarify and to Dismiss Original Appeal.
07/02/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We deny appellants' requests to dismiss this appeal. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order to obtain counsel to represent them in this matter and to cause new counsel to file a notice of appearance with this court and file a docketing statement. New counsel will be expected to participate in another settlement conference before Settlement Judge Thomas W. Gruesen. We caution appellants that failure to timely comply with this order will likely result in this appeal being dismissed as abandoned. fn1[The clerk of this court shall remove the law firm of Beckley, Singleton, Jemison , Cobeaga & List from this court's docket as counsel of record for appellants.]
08/17/1998Letter/IncomingReceived Letter. Proper person response by letter to order filed July 2, 1998.
09/09/1998Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Appearance and Request for Additional Time to File Civil Appeals Docketing Statement. Jeffrey A. Dickerson enters his appearance on behalf of appellants.
10/01/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. On August 17, 1998, appellant William North, Jr., submitted a proper person letter requesting an extension of time until September 7, 1998, to allow appellants to obtain counsel to represent them in this matter. fn1[Even though appellant has not been granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have received and considered appellant's submission.] On September 9, 1998, attorney Jeffrey A. Dickerson filed a notice of appearance on behalf of appellants. We deny the proper person request for an extension of time to obtain counsel as moot. Appellants shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement. The settlement judge shall, within 30 days from the date of this order, schedule this matter for another settlement conference . Within 10 days from the date the settlement conference is held, the settlement judge shall prepare and file with this court a settlement conference report. The clerk shall send a copy of the settlement conference notice to attorney Dickerson and forward updated materials to the settlement judge.
10/08/1998Other Other. Issued letter to Settlement Judge Gruesen enclosing updated docket sheet. Copy mailed to Jeffrey A. Dickerson with notice of settlement conference.
10/09/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
10/19/1998Other Other. Filed Response to Docketing Statement/Motion to Dismiss.
10/26/1998MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Dismiss.
10/29/1998Other Other. Filed Joinder of Respondents Imelli and Rogers in Response to Docketing Statement and Motion to Dismiss by Respondents Bell. "MISSING DOCUMENT"
11/17/1998Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Settlement Conference Report. The Settlement Conference is continued to December 7, 1998.
12/09/1998Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Settlement Conference Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.
01/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. The settlement judge also makes a determination that appellants failed to participate in good faith in the settlement conference process. Appellants shall, within 15 days form the date of this order, show cause why this court should not dismiss this appeal based on the settlement judge's determination.
01/29/1999Other Other. Filed showing of cause.
03/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. According to the settlement judge, appellants twice failed to appear at scheduled settlement conferences. On January 29, 1999, appellants filed a response to our order of January 19, 1999. The response is only partially responsive to our order. Appellants' counsel, Jeffrey A. Dickerson, shall within 15 days from the date of this order, show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed and why appellants should not be personally sanctioned for their failure to attend the second scheduled settlement conference.
03/30/1999Other Other. Filed Response to Second Order to Show Cause.
04/29/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. On March 30, 1999, appellants' counsel filed the requested response to our March 12, 1999, order. We conclude that appellant William North, Jr., should be sanctioned for his failure to appear at the second scheduled meeting. Appellant William North, Jr., shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, personally pay the sum of $100 to the Nevada Supreme Court Law Library and file proof of payment of the sanction with this court. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the imposition of additional sanctions.
05/13/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Order Partially Dismissing Appeal and Reinstating Briefing. Respondents have filed a motion to dismiss this appeal. Appellants have filed an opposition. We partially grant respondents' motion, and we dismiss Mrs. North's appeal. Respondents' motion is denied as to Mr. North's appeal. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to comply with the provisions of NRAP 9(a) and 120 days to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1).
05/19/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Pay Sanction.
07/06/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The motion filed May 19, 1999, is granted. Attorney Dickerson shall file proof of payment of the sanction with this court within 10 days of the date of this order.
07/12/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Proof of Payment of Sanction.
09/10/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: hand -delivered 9/10/99).
09/10/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Joint Appendix, Vols. I and II.
10/08/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Respondents shall have to and including November 11, 1999, to file the Answering Brief.
10/12/1999MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Respondents Gary Imelli, Leslie Imelli, and Carole Moore shall have to and including November 12, 1999, to file the Answering Briefs.
10/13/1999MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Respondent Joseph Dahl may have to and including November 12, 1999, within which to file the answering brief.
11/09/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Answering Brief. (Second Request). (Respondents Ralph Bell and Rena Bell).
11/12/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Respondents Ralph Bell and Rena Bell shall have to and including November 29, 1999, to file and serve their answering brief.
11/12/1999BriefFiled Brief. Answering Brief of respondents Gary Imelli, Leslie Imelli, and Carole Moore (Rogers)--hand delivered.
11/12/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Leave to file Supplement to Joint Appendix.
11/12/1999AppendixReceived Appendix. Supplement of Respondents Gary Imelli, Leslie Imelli, and Carole Moore (Rogers) to Joint Appendix.
11/15/1999BriefFiled Brief. Respondent, Joseph Dahl's, Answering Brief. (Mailed on: 11/12/99.)
11/18/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The supplemental joint appendix provisionally submitted on November 12, 1999, shall be filed, forthwith.
11/18/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Supplement of Respondents Gary Imelli, Leslie Imelli, and Carole Moore (Rogers) to Joint Appendix.
11/29/1999BriefFiled Brief. Answering Brief of Respondents Ralph and Rena Bell.
12/06/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief to Defendant Dahl's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: hand delivered 12/6/99.)
12/06/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief to Defendant Imelli's and Moore's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: hand delivered 12/6/99).
12/14/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief to Defendant's Ralph and Rena Bell's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: Reno/Carson 12/14/99).
03/02/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Oral Argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein.
03/02/2000Other Other. Case submitted on the record and briefs this day.
03/02/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/07/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Affirmance. Having considered the North's contentions and having concluded that they lack merit, " . . . we affirm the orders of the district court granting respondents' motions for summary judgment." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-15736
10/03/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-15792
10/03/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 4, 2000. 00-15792