judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LORI ANN DOWLIN v. CHARLES DOUGLAS DOWLIN

Case Heading (06-245)
Case Number:06-245Case Docketed On:10/23/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:LORI ANN DOWLIN v. CHARLES DOUGLAS DOWLIN
Full Title:LORI ANN DOWLIN, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. CHARLES DOUGLAS DOWLIN, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLori Ann DowlinGalen Bruce Woelk
Steve C.M. Aron
AppelleeCharles Douglas DowlinWilliam L. Hiser

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 114
Citation:162 P.3d 1202

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/23/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/23/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/23/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/23/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/15/2006Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
12/05/2006Brief - Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
01/18/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy on disk and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
01/31/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/05/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
02/05/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/08/2007Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/08/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes: Volumes I through III, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/14/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (C.M. Aron for appellant; William Hiser for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/14/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
07/23/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal orderOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/08/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/08/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/10/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for by D. Olson.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal