judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

UNIVERSITY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA V. COLIN M. BROWNE

Case Information: 10-CV-0782
Short Caption:UNIVERSITY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA V. COLIN M. BROWNEClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead: 10-CV-0100 Consolidated:10-CV-0782
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB8266-07Filed Date:06/22/2010

Opening Event Date:06/22/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/26/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/27/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantUniversity of the District of ColumbiaN
Todd S. KimNY
AppelleeColin M. Brown N
David Scher NN
AppelleeKevin Naiker N
Nakeasha Sanders NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/22/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/19/2010 Upon consideration of the notices of appeal in these matters, and it appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed in appeal no. 10-CV-100, and no transcrips is needed for appeal no. 10-CV-782, it is ORDERED , sua sponte, that appeals nos. 10-Cv-100 and 10-CV-782 are consolidated for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Superior Court shall transmit the record index for appeal no. 10-CV-782 forthwith. It is (MORE)
07/19/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's consolidated brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW) elp
07/26/2010RECORD INDEX both cases
07/26/2010RECORD COMPLETED
08/16/2010APPELLEE'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to enforce settlement
08/27/2010STIPULATION TO DISMISS APPEAL
08/31/2010APPELLEE'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to withdraw motion to enforce settlement.
09/02/2010 On consideration of appellee Colin M. Browne's motion to enforce settlement, and the stipulation of dismissal filed by the parties, and appellee Colin M. Browne's motion to withdraw the motion to enforce settlement, it is ORDERED that appellee Colin M. Browne's motion to withdraw motion is granted and his motion to enforce settlement is withdrawn. It is FURTHER ORDERED that these appeals are hereby dismissed and each party shall bear its own costs. See D.C. App. R. 13 (b)(2). (ETW) elp
09/02/2010DISMISSED
09/27/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/22/2014FiledArchived