Case: 13-05-00459-CV
13-05-00459-CV
06/08/2005
Miscellaneous/other civil
DOMINION AIR AND HEAT, LLC
SOUTHWESTERN BELL YELLOW PAGES, INC.
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/20/2005
13th Court of Appeals - Corpus Christi
07/20/2005
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/10/2006 | Record sent to storage | | |||
03/07/2006 | Record Sent | | |||
03/01/2006 | Mandate Issued | | |||
11/10/2005 | Motion for Dismissal Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
11/10/2005 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||
11/03/2005 | Record checked out | | |||
10/24/2005 | Green card in | | |||
10/24/2005 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |||
10/20/2005 | ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come | | |||
10/18/2005 | Notice for docketing statement | | |||
10/18/2005 | Notice for docketing statement | | |||
10/18/2005 | 10 day letter sent | | |||
10/18/2005 | ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come | | |||
10/07/2005 | Letter sent | | |||
10/07/2005 | Filing Fee Paid | | |||
08/29/2005 | Notice of no record received | | |||
08/22/2005 | Green card in | | |||
08/19/2005 | request for documents | | |||
08/16/2005 | Notice for docketing statement | | |||
08/16/2005 | Notice for docketing statement | | |||
08/16/2005 | Where's f/f | | |||
07/21/2005 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |||
07/20/2005 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
06/24/2005 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||
06/24/2005 | Clerk's Record Received | | |||
06/08/2005 | request for documents | | |||
06/08/2005 | Notice of appeal received | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/01/2006 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Dominion Air and Heat, L.L.C. | Appellant | Thomas J. Kerr |
Southwestern Bell Yellow Pages, Inc. | Appellee | Lisa White Watkins |
Trial Court Information
County Civil Court at Law No 3
Harris
Honorable Hon. Lynn Bradshaw-Hull
813742