judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TERRA WEST DEVELOPMENT VS. GEM HOMES

Case Information: 36213
Short Caption:TERRA WEST DEVELOPMENT VS. GEM HOMESCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33666
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A327609Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:BeckerCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:11/22/2000 / Segel, M.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/05/2000OtherDisqualification of Justice Becker. Sat in district court proceedings.
06/05/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Rawlings Olson Cannon Gormley & Desruisseaux--check no. 053371.
06/05/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09354
06/06/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Confirm as Counsel. To James, Driggs firm. Due Date: 10 days
06/19/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Notice to Confirm as Counsel on Appeal. 00-10477
08/09/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Counsel of record for respondents, shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file a response to the notice to confirm as counsel on this appeal. 00-13805
08/18/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Non-Representation (James, Driggs, Walch, Santoro, Kearney, Johnson & Thompson). 00-14446
09/27/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On August 18, 2000, the law firm of James, Driggs, Walch, Santoro, Kearney, Johnson & Thompson filed a notice of non-representation of respondents. The clerk of this court shall forthwith remove the law firm of James, Driggs, Walch, Santoro, Kearney, Johnson & Thompson from the court's docket as counsel of record for respondents. Respondents shall have 60 days from the date of this order to obtain counsel and cause counsel to file a notice of appearance with the clerk of this court. If respondents do not intend to obtain counsel they shall so inform this court in writing within 60 days from the date of this order. Respondents' counsel, if obtained, will be expected to participate in the settlement conference process to which this appeal is assigned. 00-17053
11/16/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing respondent: Nicholas J. Santoro and James E. Whitmire of the law firm of Santoro, Driggs, Walch, Kearney, Johnson & Thompson. 00-20164
11/22/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: M. Nelson Segel. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/26/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: February 27, 2001. 01-01779
03/02/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: March 15, 2001. 01-03861
06/04/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: July 24, 2001. 01-09293
07/30/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: August 16, 2001. 01-12804
10/01/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: November 13, 2001. 01-16491
11/15/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 23, 2002. 01-19096
02/19/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 60 days. A new status report, or dismissal, will be forwarded to the Court on or before April 15, 2002. 02-03147
06/13/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The Settlement Judge will advise the Supreme Court on or before July 8, 2002, whether this matter has been resolved or needs to proceed to briefing. 02-10290
07/03/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Rawlings firm. 02-11396
11/08/2002Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 02-19316
11/26/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 02-20379
11/26/2002Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.