Case Heading (06-198) | |||||
Case Number: | 06-198 | Case Docketed On: | 08/30/2006 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Third Judicial District Lincoln County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27) | ||
Short Title: | STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION v. TED G. SLAYMAKER | ||||
Full Title: | STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellant (Respondent), v. TED G. SLAYMAKER, Appellee (Petitioner). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Department of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation Division | Patrick J. Crank John William Renneisen Kristi Marie Radosevich Steven R. Czoschke |
Appellee | Ted G. Slaymaker | David M. Gosar |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | |
Opinion Number: | 2007 WY 65 |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
08/30/2006 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
08/30/2006 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
08/30/2006 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
08/30/2006 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
10/06/2006 | Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk and copy of designation of record on appeal | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
11/30/2006 | Brief - Appellee; received copy of designation of record on appeal | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
12/08/2006 | Brief - Appellant reply; received copy of brief on disk | Brief | Appellant reply | Final | |
12/08/2006 | Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendation | Notice-Internal | Brief only recommendation | Final | |
12/11/2006 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
12/19/2006 | Order - Assigning to expedited docket | Order | Assigning to brief only docket | Final | |
12/26/2006 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
04/25/2007 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the Court | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
05/03/2007 | Motion - Fees and costs | Motion | Fees and costs | Final | |
05/23/2007 | Order - Other. Order awarding attorney's fees and costs. | Order | Other | Final | |
05/23/2007 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
05/23/2007 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
05/23/2007 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
05/23/2007 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final |