judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TYON C. NICHOLS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-0781
Short Caption:TYON C. NICHOLS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD5222-10Filed Date:06/21/2010

Opening Event Date:06/21/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/09/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/07/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTyon C. Nichols Y
Jejomar G. UntalanNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/21/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/20/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Jejomar Untalan, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
07/20/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Jejomar Untalan, Esquire
08/20/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
09/09/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (4pgs/Tape) 3/25/10 proc.
09/09/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (4pgs/Tape) 4/14/10 proc.
09/09/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (4pgs/Tape) 6/16/10 proc.
09/09/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (91pgs/Tape) 6/17/10 proc. w/CD included
09/09/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/20/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (Pretrial Services report filed 3/25/10)**********SEALED
09/20/2010RECORD INDEX
09/20/2010RECORD COPIES
09/23/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillp)
11/02/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until January 18, 2011
11/29/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before January 18, 2011. (By: JAC)
01/18/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL (without Appellant's Statement)
01/20/2011TMC - appellant's motion to dismiss
02/09/2011 ORDERED that COUNSEL'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED and this APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED W/O PREJUDICE due to appellant's failure to assist in the prosecution of the appeal. See DC App. R. 13 (a). (GLTHTE) (rm)
02/09/2011DISMISSED
03/07/2011MANDATE ISSUED