Case: 01-05-00564-CV
01-05-00564-CV
06/20/2005
Forcible entry and detainer (Prop. 24.007)
S.H.A.R.E. Investments Inc., Odell Bennett, Jr., and All Other Occupants
Ellis Morrow
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/29/2006 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |||
04/07/2006 | Motion for Rehearing Due | | |||
03/23/2006 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismiss appeal |
| ||
03/23/2006 | Inserted for Envelope generation. | | |||
03/22/2006 | Submitted | | |||
03/21/2006 | Case ready to be set | | |||
02/27/2006 | Response due to a motion or Court's Order. | | |||
02/07/2006 | Appellant's brief past due. If not filed court may dismiss | | |||
10/24/2005 | Response due to a motion or Court's Order. | | |||
10/05/2005 | Court Reporter's Notice to Court Regarding Status of Record | | |||
10/03/2005 | Reporter's Record Past Due Notice sent | | |||
08/26/2005 | Record due | | |||
08/09/2005 | Clerk's record filed (transcript) | | |||
06/08/2005 | NOA received in COA from trial court. | | |||
05/09/2005 | Notice of appeal filed | | |||
05/09/2005 | Motion for new trial filed in trial court (civil Tex. R. Civ. P. 329b, criminal TRAP 21) | | |||
04/28/2005 | Date judgment signed by trial judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/29/2006 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Morrow, Ellis | Appellee | Richard L. Merrill |
Bennett, Odell | Appellant | Odell Bennett |
Share Investments, Inc. | Appellant |
Trial Court Information
Co Ct at Law No 3 & Probate Ct
Brazoria
Honorable James A. Blackstock
CI033368