judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RONALD BURROWS V. DC DEPT OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS., ET AL

Case Information: 10-AA-0792
Short Caption:RONALD BURROWS V. DC DEPT OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS., ET ALClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Worker's Compensation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CRB79-09Filed Date:07/02/2010

Opening Event Date:07/02/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/10/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerRonald Burrows N
Benjamin T. BoscoloNY
Matthew J. PefferNY
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services - Worker's Comp.N
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/02/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
07/02/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
07/06/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, Todd Kim Esq. & Gregory Lamb, Esq.
07/19/2010 ORDERED that PETITIONER SHALL, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been taken from a NON-FINAL ORDER. See Washington Hospital Center v. DC Dept of Employment Serv, 712 A.2d 1018 (DC 1998). (BY: ETW)
07/19/2010TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
08/02/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
08/19/2010 ORDERED that the PFR IS HEREBY DISMISSED as having been taken from a NON-FINAL ORDER. See Washington Hospital Center v. DC Dep't of Employ Servs, 712 A.2d 1018 (DC 1998)...SEE HARDCOPY (KRBRKG) (rl)
08/19/2010DISMISSED
09/10/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/18/2014FiledArchived