Case Information: 36215 | |||
Short Caption: | DIV. OF INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS VS. WORLD BOOK | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A374224 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 06/09/2000 / Cohen, Larry | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/05/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/05/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-09361 | |
06/09/2000 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Larry J. Cohen. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
06/14/2000 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 00-10131 | |
07/05/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. | 00-11426 | |
07/10/2000 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. | ||
09/08/2000 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: no date given. | 00-15858 | |
05/29/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: second or third week of July. | 01-08916 | |
06/08/2001 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Address. (EICON). | 01-09625 | |
07/30/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 01-12808 | |
10/08/2001 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. | 01-16873 | |
10/24/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK | 01-17922 | |
10/24/2001 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |