judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JEFFREY RAYMOND STARKEY v. MICHELLE ELISE STARKEY

Case Heading (06-256)
Case Number:06-256Case Docketed On:11/01/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:JEFFREY RAYMOND STARKEY v. MICHELLE ELISE STARKEY
Full Title:JEFFREY RAYMOND STARKEY, Appellant (Defendant), v. MICHELLE ELISE STARKEY, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJeffrey Raymond StarkeyGibson Sean Benham
AppelleeMichelle Elise StarkeyPatrick J. Crank
Robin Sessions Cooley
Dan S. Wilde
Ellen Rutledge

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 106
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/01/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/01/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/01/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/01/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/18/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/30/2007Brief - Appellee State of Wyoming, Department of Family Services; received copy on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
02/01/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
02/20/2007Brief - Appellant reply - "Appellant's response to Appellee's brief"BriefAppellant replyFinal
02/20/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/20/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/26/2007Notice-Incoming - Filing of recordNotice-IncomingFiling of recordFinal
02/26/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes: Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcript; Volume III, confidential file.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/26/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
07/11/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/27/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/27/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/27/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/27/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/31/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 7/30/07 by Michelle Crotteau.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal