judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WASHINGTON VS. KING

Case Information: 36214
Short Caption:WASHINGTON VS. KINGCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D244129Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/12/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/05/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. see district court order filed 6/15/00.
06/05/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09357
06/05/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
06/15/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Copy of Order Waiving Costs filed in the district court on 06/06/00. 00-10215
06/20/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 00-10531
07/12/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Mailed on 07/10/00. 00-11986
07/12/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." fn1[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from appellant.] NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-16081
10/10/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal this day. 00-16200
10/10/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 18, 2000. 00-16200