judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DONALD F. BIRCH v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-103)
Case Number:06-103Case Docketed On:05/05/2005
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Certiorari
Short Title:DONALD F. BIRCH v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DONALD F. BIRCH, Petitioner, v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerDonald F. Birch Pro Se
RespondentThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/05/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/05/2006Petition - Writ - certiorariPetitionWrit - certiorariFinal
05/05/2006Motion - In forma pauperisMotionIn forma pauperisFinal
05/30/2006Order - Petition for review - granting in partOrderPetition for review - grantFinal
07/06/2006Event - Phone Call from Judge Ryckman re hearing. Petitioner asked for and received appointment of counse. May need to extend time for final determination. Faxed copies of pleadings filed in this matterEventPhone CallFinal
08/01/2006Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Order on remand, Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Following Evidentiary Hearing of July 19, 2006 with supporting documentation and transcriptsRulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOrder on remandFinal
08/22/2006Order - Petition for review - denyOrderPetition for review - denyFinal
08/22/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal