judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00689-CR
14-89-00689-CR
07/25/1989
Other Felony
Munoz, Arnoldo Richard
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/12/1991Mandate Issued
07/12/1991Mandate Issued
07/11/1991Case stored
06/27/1991Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
05/29/1991Opinion issuedREFUSED
03/18/1991Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
02/11/1991Extend time to file PDR FILED
02/06/1991Extend time to file PDR DISPOSEDGRANTED
02/04/1991No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
01/18/1991No motion for rehearing FILED
01/03/1991Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
01/03/1991Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
01/03/1991Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
11/13/1990Submitted
11/13/1990Submission
11/13/1990Submitted
10/15/1990Submission
09/10/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/10/1990Case ready to be set
09/10/1990Case ready to be set
08/09/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
07/30/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
07/12/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
07/05/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
06/21/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
06/21/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
06/21/1990Motion to consolidate DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
06/12/1990Brf.RECD.ARGU.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA
06/12/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
06/12/1990Motion to consolidate FILED-ANT,APE,APP
05/30/1990No description available.
04/12/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
04/05/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/28/1990No description available.
02/08/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
02/02/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/29/1990No description available.
12/27/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
10/05/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
09/29/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
09/26/1989No description available.
08/03/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
07/25/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
07/25/1989Transcript FILED
07/25/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/26/1989Date of Sentence
05/26/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/11/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasTimothy G. Taft
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantRenato Santos, Jr.
Trial Court Information
185th District Court
Harris
Honorable CARL WALKER
520,341
Life in TDC/$10,000 fine