judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00679-CR
14-89-00679-CR
07/24/1989
Robbery
Thompson, Gary
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/16/1990Case stored
07/03/1990Mandate Issued
07/03/1990Mandate Issued
06/18/1990No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
06/01/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
05/17/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
05/17/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
05/16/1990Submitted
05/16/1990Submission
05/16/1990Submitted
04/24/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
04/24/1990Case ready to be set
04/24/1990Case ready to be set
03/29/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/29/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
03/23/1990Brf.RECD.No Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA,
03/23/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/20/1990No description available.
02/22/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
02/16/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
02/05/1990No description available.
01/11/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
12/21/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/20/1989No description available.
11/17/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
09/19/1989Transcript FILED
08/11/1989Motion for new trial FILED
07/24/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/21/1989Date of Sentence
07/21/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/16/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasAlan Curry
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantHon. J. R. Seeman
Trial Court Information
228th District Court
Harris
Honorable TED POE
528,233
30 years TDC/$1,062 fine