judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: C-8886
C-8886
07/24/1989
App Writ of Error
TEXAS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE ASSOCIATION
ROBERTO G. GONZALEZ
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
08/28/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
07/24/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
04/19/1990list missing briefs when case is separated(remarksCOPIES OF M/E/T
04/19/1990Record returned to Court of AppealsNO REHEARING FILED
03/21/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
08/30/1989Case forwarded to Court
08/30/1989No description available.
08/28/1989Reply to Response
08/09/1989MET to file reply disposed ofFiling granted
07/24/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
04/19/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
13-88-00101-CV
Rev/Remanded
772 SW2d 145, 05-18-89
13th Court of Appeals
Honorable J. BONNER DORSEY
Trial Court Information
117th District Court
Nueces
Honorable Robert M. Blackmon
87-984-B