judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00682-CR
14-89-00682-CR
07/24/1989
Auto Theft
Mosley, Myron Bernard
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/03/1991Case stored
04/22/1991Mandate Issued
04/22/1991Mandate Issued
04/07/1991No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
03/11/1991Extend time to file PDR DISPOSEDGRANTED
03/06/1991Extend time to file PDR FILED
02/22/1991No motion for rehearing FILED
02/07/1991Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
02/07/1991Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
09/19/1990Submitted
09/19/1990Submission
09/19/1990Submitted
09/12/1990Submission
08/21/1990Submission
06/13/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
06/13/1990Case ready to be set
06/13/1990Case ready to be set
05/17/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
05/11/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
04/19/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
04/12/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/16/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/01/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
02/20/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/07/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
12/01/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/26/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
10/16/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/15/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
09/14/1989Transcript FILED
07/24/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/19/1989Date of Sentence
07/19/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/03/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantLaura Ingle
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasTimothy G. Taft
Trial Court Information
182nd District Court
Harris
Honorable DONALD K. SHIPLEY
510,794
75 years TDC