judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00683-CR
14-89-00683-CR
07/24/1989
Other Drug Possession
Miller, Donald Earl
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/07/1989Case stored
09/07/1989Transcript FILED
08/24/1989Mandate Issued
08/24/1989Mtn.dismiss DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STAGRANTED
08/24/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
08/24/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
08/24/1989Mandate Issued
08/23/1989Submitted
08/23/1989Submission
08/23/1989Submitted
08/08/1989Mtn.Dismiss FILED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA
07/24/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/14/1989Date of Sentence
07/14/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/07/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantWilliam T. Cornelius
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes, Jr.
Trial Court Information
208th District Court
Harris
Honorable CHARLES E. SHERRILL
521,999
3 years TDC