judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-00869-CR
05-89-00869-CR
07/24/1989
Burglary
Smith, Hubert Thomas
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/15/1990Mandate Issued
06/15/1990Mandate Issued
04/12/1990Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
04/12/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/12/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/16/1990Submission
02/16/1990Submitted
02/16/1990Submission
02/16/1990Submitted
01/17/1990MattConv
11/17/1989Brief Filed
11/17/1989Case ready to be set
11/17/1989Case ready to be set
11/02/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/01/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/19/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/18/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/19/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/18/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/22/1989Brief Filed
08/07/1989Transcript Filed
08/01/1989Statement of Facts Filed
07/24/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/13/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/13/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/15/1990Case StoredDestroy 25 yrs after date of final disposition
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 5
Dallas
F89-79680-ML
20 years TDC