judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00684-CR
14-89-00684-CR
07/24/1989
Theft
Akins, Clyde Edward
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/04/1991Case stored
12/18/1990Mandate Issued
12/18/1990Mandate Issued
12/03/1990No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
11/16/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
11/01/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
11/01/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
10/23/1990Submitted
10/23/1990Submission
10/23/1990Submitted
09/27/1990Submission
06/15/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
06/15/1990Case ready to be set
06/15/1990Case ready to be set
06/07/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
05/31/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
05/03/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
05/03/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
04/25/1990Brf.RECD.ARGU.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA
04/25/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
04/23/1990No description available.
03/29/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
03/22/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/21/1990No description available.
02/22/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
02/16/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/25/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
01/17/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/09/1990No description available.
12/07/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
12/07/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
11/29/1989Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL
11/28/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
11/17/1989No description available.
10/05/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
09/29/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
09/14/1989Transcript FILED
07/24/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/20/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
07/19/1989Date of Sentence
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/04/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantCornel A. Williams
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasRoger A. Haseman
Trial Court Information
185th District Court
Harris
Honorable DAN E. WALTON
532,306
25 years in TDC