judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals

Case: 13-89-00287-CV
13-89-00287-CV
07/24/1989
Personal Injuries/Damages
Garcia, Mariano F., et al.
Schneider National Carrier, Inc., et al.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/14/2019Document filed
01/09/2019Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk
11/16/2018Case stored
11/05/2018Case stored
04/08/1991Mandate Issued
02/21/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/14/1991Letter sent
10/04/1990Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/04/1990Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/13/1990Submitted
09/13/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
09/13/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
09/13/1990Submission
09/12/1990Motion for Dismissal Filed
09/12/1990Motion for Dismissal Filed
09/04/1990Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
08/02/1990Submission
06/15/1990Brief Filed
06/15/1990Oral argument requested
05/17/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/09/1990Brief Filed
05/09/1990Oral argument requested
05/07/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/29/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/15/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/08/1990Motion to Supplement DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/28/1990Filing Fee Paid
02/22/1990Exhibits Filed
02/22/1990Exhibits received
02/22/1990Copy of an order
02/20/1990Motion to Supplement
02/20/1990Brief Filed
02/20/1990Case ready to be set
02/20/1990Oral argument requested
01/25/1990Filing Fee Paid
01/25/1990Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
01/22/1990Court Reporter's Affidavit
01/18/1990Statement of Facts Received
01/18/1990Statement of Facts Filed
01/18/1990Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
01/15/1990Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
01/04/1990Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
01/04/1990Order Entered
01/04/1990Court Reporter's Affidavit
12/21/1989Court Reporter's Affidavit
12/15/1989Filing Fee Paid
12/15/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
11/16/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/03/1989Filing Fee Paid
11/03/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
10/05/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
09/29/1989Letter sent
09/28/1989Filing Fee Paid
09/25/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
08/31/1989Mot ext time file STRAN DispMotion or Writ Granted
08/31/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
08/11/1989Supplemental transcript recieved
08/11/1989Supplemental transcript filed
08/08/1989Letter sent
08/07/1989Due date for record to be filed
08/04/1989Filing Fee Paid
08/04/1989Filing Fee Paid
08/03/1989Mot ext time file STRANS
08/03/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
07/27/1989Filing Fee Paid
07/26/1989Supplemental transcript filed
07/24/1989Transcript Received
07/24/1989Transcript Filed
07/24/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/08/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
105th District Court
Kleberg
Honorable J. Manuel Banales
12995