judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00687-CV
14-89-00687-CV
07/24/1989
Contract
Milyasevich, Leslie Conrads A/K/A Conrads, Leslie
Milyasevich Interests, Inc. and Milyasevich, Joseph J.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/07/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
07/18/1990Case stored
07/10/1990Mandate Issued
07/10/1990Mandate Issued
06/25/1990No description available.
05/24/1990Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
05/11/1990Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
05/03/1990Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STADENIED
04/26/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED AS MODIFIED
04/26/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED AS MODIFIED
04/25/1990Opposition filed
04/23/1990Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
04/17/1990Submitted
04/17/1990Submission
04/17/1990Submitted
03/21/1990Submission
10/09/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/09/1989Case ready to be set
10/09/1989Case ready to be set
09/13/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/07/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STADENIED
08/30/1989Extend time to file record FILED-ANT,APEMOOT
08/17/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/14/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
08/07/1989Extend time to file record FILED - ANT, APE, APP
07/24/1989Transcript FILED
07/24/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/13/1989Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/07/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantHelene A. Sterns
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeCandice C. Smith
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeEdwin Lamm, III
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantHon. Mark R. Read
Trial Court Information
Co Civil Ct at Law No 4
Harris
525,993