judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00753-CR
01-89-00753-CR
07/24/1989
Assault & battery
Fontenot, Stoney Raymond
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/28/2010Letter received
07/19/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/19/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
06/30/1990No petition for review or writ of error was filed
06/15/1990Motion for rehearing was not filed
05/31/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/31/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/08/1990Submitted
05/08/1990Submission
05/08/1990Submitted
03/28/1990Submission
02/09/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
02/09/1990Case ready to be set
02/09/1990Case ready to be set
01/17/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
01/04/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Motion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
12/18/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
11/20/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
11/02/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
10/19/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
09/19/1989Statement of facts filed
09/18/1989Transcript filed
07/24/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/21/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
07/21/1989Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/19/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn Brook
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - State of Texasbill Hawkins
StateCriminal - AppellantLinda Graham Cryer
Trial Court Information
177th District Court
Harris
509,155
30 yrs tdc