judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1074-89
PD-1074-89
07/24/1989
PDR Case Type
HAYES, LONNIE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/20/1989FINAL DISPRefused
10/04/1989PDR DISPRefused
08/25/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/24/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/01/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hayes, LonnieApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)W. David Carter
STATE OF TEXASStateJr., John F. Miller
Court of Appeals Information:
06-88-00027-CR
Aff 6-6-89
6th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
202nd District Court
Bowie
Honorable Guy Jones
85 F 103-202