judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1073-89
PD-1073-89
07/24/1989
PDR Case Type
DOUGLAS, GEORGE, JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/20/1989FINAL DISPRefused
10/04/1989PDR DISPRefused
08/25/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/24/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/01/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateTom Maness
DOUGLAS, GEORGEJR.Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)James A. Delee
Court of Appeals Information:
09-89-00046-CR
Aff 6-21-89
9th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
252nd District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Leonard J. Giblin, Jr.
50594