judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00749-CV
01-89-00749-CV
07/24/1989
Miscellaneous/other civil
Credit Management & Computer Systems, dba Credit Mgmt.
Craig Baker Marble Co. Inc. and Craig Baker, Ind.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/04/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/04/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
12/01/1990No petition for review or writ of error was filed
11/01/1990Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
09/12/1990Motion for rehearing filed
08/31/1990Motion for rehearing disposedGrant motion
08/31/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
08/31/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
08/31/1990Motion for rehearing granted
06/01/1990Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
05/18/1990Motion for rehearing filed
05/03/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/03/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/13/1990Submitted
03/13/1990Submission
03/13/1990Submitted
01/26/1990Submission
11/14/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
11/14/1989Case ready to be set
11/14/1989Case ready to be set
10/20/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
09/07/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
09/01/1989Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
08/24/1989Filing fee paid
08/24/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
07/24/1989Transcript filed
07/24/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/19/1989Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/04/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - AppellantMichael Davis
StateAppellantHarold Seligman
Trial Court Information
Co Civil Ct at Law No 3
Harris
523,970