judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals

Case: 07-89-00258-CV
07-89-00258-CV
07/24/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Wilson, Ruth
Brock, Helen
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/26/1991Mandate Issued
07/09/1991Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
10/03/1990Submitted
10/03/1990Submission
09/12/1990Submission
09/18/1989Brief Filed
09/18/1989Case ready to be set
08/23/1989Brief Filed
07/24/1989Do not use
07/24/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/26/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
WilsonAppellantWilliam L. Rivers
BrockAppelleeMack Sansing
Trial Court Information
84th District Court
Ochiltree
Honorable Juan E. Blackburn
7121