judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-00874-CV
05-89-00874-CV
07/24/1989
Contract
Absol, Inc. NKA Group Nine Financial Corporation
William G. Keeler, Jr. and Zahnd Distribution, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order enteredDestroy
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
10/16/1997Record RetentionDestroy
10/31/1989Mandate Issued
10/31/1989Mandate Issued
08/31/1989Order EnteredDismissed
08/31/1989Order EnteredDismissed
08/14/1989Collection letter on Filing Fee
07/24/1989Transcript Filed
07/24/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/23/1989Appeal Bond Filed
03/27/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 5
Dallas
cc88-11433-e