Case Information: 33457 | |||
Short Caption: | JOYNER (PATRICK) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - 7269 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/11/1998 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/11/1998 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 98-00341 | |
12/14/1998 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: Arraignment Hearing--9/14/98; Arraignment Hearing--9/21/98; Sentencing Hearing--11/16/98. Court Reporter: Cheryl L. Belden. | 98-00378 | |
12/31/1998 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 98-00582 | |
12/31/1998 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 98-00587 | |
01/08/1999 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 99-00108 | |
01/08/1999 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. Appendix to Respondent's Fast Track Response. | 99-00109 | |
02/12/1999 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99A-WM/DA/NB | 99-00986 | |
03/09/1999 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 99-01643 | |
03/09/1999 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/16/1999 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 11, 1999. | 99-01643 |