judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-1441
B-1441
03/19/1969
Application for Writ of Error
MILDRED THOMAS, ET AL.
T.C. BATESON CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, MOBLEY-SPEED CEMENT CONTRACTOR
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/05/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/03/1969Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/05/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
05/05/1969Response to PetitionPetitioner
03/19/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
03/19/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/05/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/03/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/05/1969Response to Petition
05/05/1969Response to Petition
03/27/1969Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
03/19/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/19/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/19/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mildred Thomas, et al.Petitioner
Mobley-Speed Cement ContractorRespondent
T.C. Bateson Construction CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information